VA SB5032 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (18-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (18-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Assault and battery; penalty. Eliminates the mandatory minimum term of confinement for a simple assault or an assault and battery committed against a judge; magistrate; law-enforcement officer; correctional officer; person directly involved in the care, treatment, or supervision of inmates; firefighter; or volunteer firefighter or any emergency medical services personnel. The bill provides that any person charged with such offense where the degree of culpability is slight, a jury or the court may find the accused not guilty of such offense but guilty of a simple assault or assault and battery, punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill also provides that before any arrest, indictment, or service of a petition in the case of a juvenile is made for an alleged assault and battery against a law-enforcement officer, such alleged assault and battery shall be investigated by another law-enforcement officer who was not the subject of such alleged assault and battery and the arrest, indictment, or service of a petition shall be approved by the attorney for the Commonwealth.
Title
Assault and battery; penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Janet Howell [D] | Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Joseph Morrissey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House: Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (18-Y 1-N) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 15-N) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Passed by indefinitely in Courts of Justice (18-Y 1-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (21-Y 15-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5032S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200824D-S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200824D-S1 |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200717D |