VA SB5035 | 2020 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (Effective 7/1/21)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies. Authorizes a locality to establish a law-enforcement civilian oversight body that may (i) receive, investigate, and issue findings on complaints from civilians regarding conduct of law-enforcement officers and civilian employees; (ii) investigate and issue findings on incidents, including the use of force by a law-enforcement officer, death or serious injury to any person held in custody, serious abuse of authority or misconduct, allegedly discriminatory stops, and other incidents regarding the conduct of law-enforcement officers or civilian employees; (iii) make binding disciplinary determinations in cases that involve serious breaches of departmental and professional standards; (iv) investigate policies, practices, and procedures of law-enforcement agencies and make recommendations regarding changes to such policies, practices, and procedures; (v) review all investigations conducted internally by law-enforcement agencies and issue findings regarding the accuracy, completeness, and impartiality of such investigations and the sufficiency of any discipline resulting from such investigations; (vi) request reports of the annual expenditures of law-enforcement agencies and make budgetary recommendations; (vii) make public reports on the activities of the law-enforcement civilian oversight body; and (viii) undertake any other duties as reasonably necessary for the law-enforcement civilian oversight body to effectuate its lawful purpose to effectively oversee the law-enforcement agencies as authorized by the locality. Such oversight bodies are not authorized to oversee sheriff's departments. The bill provides that a law-enforcement officer who is subject to a binding disciplinary determination may file a grievance requesting a final hearing pursuant to the locality's local grievance procedures. The bill also provides that a retired law-enforcement officer may serve on such law-enforcement civilian oversight body as an advisory, nonvoting ex officio member. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2021, and is identical to

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law-enforcement civilian oversight bodies; localities may establish, duties, effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (53-Y 35-N) (Y: 53 N: 35 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N) (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (22-Y 14-N) (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N) (Y: 1 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N) (Y: 51 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 15-N) (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N) (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-28 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 30 (Effective 7/1/21)
2020-10-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020
2020-10-21SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020
2020-10-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-10-16SenateSigned by President
2020-10-16SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB5035ER)
2020-10-16SenateEnrolled
2020-10-14HouseVOTE: Agreed To (53-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14HouseConference report agreed to by House (53-Y 35-N)
2020-10-14SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (21-Y 17-N)
2020-10-14SenateConference substitute printed 20201370D-S3
2020-10-14 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2020-10-07HouseDelegates: Herring, Price, Miyares
2020-10-07HouseConferees appointed by House
2020-10-07SenateSenators: Hashmi, McClellan, Stuart
2020-10-07SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2020-10-07SenateSenate acceded to request (22-Y 14-N)
2020-10-07HouseHouse requested conference committee
2020-10-07HouseHouse insisted on substitute
2020-10-02SenateHouse substitute rejected by Senate (1-Y 37-N)
2020-09-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (51-Y 46-N)
2020-09-25HousePassed House with substitute (51-Y 46-N)
2020-09-25HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB5035H1
2020-09-25HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20201228D-H1
2020-09-25HouseRead third time
2020-09-24HouseRead second time
2020-09-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 20201228D-H1
2020-09-21HouseReported from Public Safety with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-09-17HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2020-09-17HouseRead first time
2020-09-17HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-09-15SenateRead third time and passed Senate (20-Y 15-N)
2020-09-10SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5035S2
2020-09-10SenateCommittee substitute from Finance and Appropriations agreed to 20201005D-S2
2020-09-10SenateCommittee substitute from Judiciary rejected 20200902D-S1s4410
2020-09-10SenateRead second time
2020-09-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2020-09-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20201005D-S2
2020-09-03SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 5-N)
2020-08-20SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-08-20SenateCommittee substitute printed 20200879D-S1
2020-08-20SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2020-08-14SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2020-08-14SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200588D

Same As/Similar To

HB5055 (Same As) 2020-10-28 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 29 (effective 7/1/21)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521507(n/a)See Bill Text
152723(n/a)See Bill Text
223002(n/a)See Bill Text
40151.4:4(n/a)See Bill Text
91300(n/a)See Bill Text
91500(n/a)See Bill Text
91507(n/a)See Bill Text
91601(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+sum+SB5035&202+sum+SB5035
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035S2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035S3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+ful+SB5035ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S03V0021+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+S05V0017+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0086SB5035+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0115SB5035+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+H15V0019+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0088+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0197SB5035+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0230SB5035+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+SV0284SB5035+SB5035
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?202+vot+HV0202+SB5035

Bill Comments

feedback