VA SB5036 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; local special events license; limitations on events during public health emergency. Provides that no limitation on the number of special events that may be held by a local special events licensee shall be imposed during the effective dates of any rule, regulation, or order that is issued by the Governor or State Health Commissioner to meet a public health emergency and that effectively reduces allowable restaurant seating capacity. Under current law, local special events licensees are limited to holding 16 special events per year. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; local special events license, limitations on events, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0034) | |
2020-10-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 34 (effective 10/28/20) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5036ER) |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-07 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Passed House with amendment (94-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-10-07 | House | Emergency clause added |
2020-10-07 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-10-07 | House | Read third time |
2020-10-02 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-10-02 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-29 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-21 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-08-14 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200732D |