VA SB505 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Doctorate of medical science; licensure and practice. Establishes requirements for licensure and practice as a doctorate of medical science. The bill provides that it is unlawful to practice as a doctorate of medical science unless licensed by the Board of Medicine (Board) and requires that an applicant for licensure, among other requirements, (i) hold an active unrestricted license to practice as a physician assistant in the Commonwealth or another jurisdiction and be able to demonstrate engagement in active clinical practice as a physician assistant under physician supervision for at least three years and (ii) be a graduate of at least a two-year doctor of medical science program or an equivalent program that is accredited by a regional body under the U.S Department of Education and an accrediting body approved by the Board. The bill provides that doctorates of medical science can practice only as part of a patient care team at a hospital or group medical practice engaged in primary care and are required to maintain appropriate collaboration and consultation, as evidenced in a written or electronic practice agreement, with at least one patient care team physician. The bill requires the Board to establish the scope of practice for doctorates of medical science and to promulgate regulations regarding collaboration and consultation among a patient care team and requirements for the practice agreement. The bill outlines the prescriptive authority of doctorates of medical science. The bill also authorizes various powers and requires various duties of a doctorate of medical science where such powers and duties are, under current law, given to and required of physician assistants and nurse practitioners.
Title
Doctorate of medical science; establishes requirements for licensure and practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103047D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2400.01:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2400.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2953.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2953.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3300.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3482.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3812 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |