VA SB5050 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-22 - Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Parole; notice and certification; monthly reports. Provides that the Department of Corrections (the Department) shall release a prisoner no sooner than 21 business days after the date of notification by the Virginia Parole Board (the Board) to the appropriate attorney for the Commonwealth of the decision to grant parole. The bill authorizes the Board to make such notification electronically and by certified mail; under current law only certified mail may be used. The bill requires that the monthly reports issued by the Board regarding actions taken on the parole of prisoners (i) be published on the last day of the month and (ii) include the offenses of which prisoners considered for parole were convicted, the jurisdictions in which such offenses were committed, and the amount of time served by such prisoners. However, a prisoner's name shall be included on report only if the attorney for the Commonwealth and any victims have been notified; otherwise, inclusion on the report is delayed to the following month. The bill requires that when notice is sent to a victim of the victim's right to present evidence to the Board of the impact that the release of a prisoner will have on the victim, such notice shall also be sent to the attorney for the Commonwealth and the director of the victim/witness program of the jurisdiction in which the prisoner's offense occurred.
Title
Parole; notice and certification, monthly reports, discretionary early consideration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House: Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to (20-Y 18-N) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (10-Y 4-N) (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-22 | House | Tabled in Courts of Justice (13-Y 7-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20201065D-ES1 |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Title replaced 20201065D-S1 |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute with amendment SB5050ES1 |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Obenshain agreed to |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to (20-Y 18-N) |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20201065D-S1 (Surovell) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (10-Y 4-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200490D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 154.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 160 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |