VA SB5053 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Burning cross on property of another or public place with intent to intimidate; penalty. Increases the penalty for burning a cross on the property of another or public place with intent to intimidate from a Class 6 felony to a Class 4 felony.
Title
Burning cross on property of another or public place with intent to intimidate; increases penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Previous question ordered (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-09 - Senate - Senate: Previous question ordered (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Motion to recommit to committee agreed to (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Previous question ordered (20-Y 19-N) |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Incorporates SB5055 (Reeves) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Incorporates SB5054 (Reeves) |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200898D-S1 |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200193D |