VA SB5081 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-28 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Outbreaks of communicable disease of public health threat; posting of information; emergency. Requires the Department of Health to make information about outbreaks of communicable diseases of public health threat at any medical care facility, residential or day program, service or facility licensed or operated by any agency of the Commonwealth, school, or summer camp currently required to report an outbreak of a communicable disease to the Department available to the public on a website maintained by the Department. Such information shall include the name of the place at which the outbreak has occurred and the number of confirmed cases of and deaths resulting from such communicable disease reported by each such place. This bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Outbreaks of communicable disease of public health threat; posting of information about cases.
Sponsors
Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. Stephen Newman [R] | Sen. David Suetterlein [R] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-14 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (34-Y 2-N) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) (Y: 0 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-28 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0024) | |
2020-10-28 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 24 (effective 10/28/20) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5081ER) |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-14 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-14 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-12 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-10-07 | House | Delegates: Sickles, Hayes, Head |
2020-10-07 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Senators: Barker, Hashmi, Kiggans |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (34-Y 2-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-10-07 | House | House insisted on amendment |
2020-10-02 | Senate | House amendment rejected by Senate (0-Y 38-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-09-25 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20200886D-ES1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB5081ES1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Emergency clause added |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Barker agreed to |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20200886D-S1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB5105 (Suetterlein) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Incorporates SB5026 (Newman) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20200886D-S1 |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 08/18/20 20200802D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5026 (Similar To) 2020-08-19 - Incorporated by Education and Health
SB5105 (Similar To) 2020-08-19 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB5048 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)
SB5105 (Similar To) 2020-08-19 - Incorporated by Education and Health
HB5048 (Same As) 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0012)