VA SB5082 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on October 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Certain hospices, home care organizations, private providers, assisted living facilities, and adult day care centers; immunity from civil liability; COVID-19; emergency. Provides that a licensed hospice, home care organization, private provider, assisted living facility, or adult day care center that delivers care to or withholds care from a patient, resident, or person receiving services who is diagnosed as being or is believed to be infected with the COVID-19 virus shall not be liable for any injury or wrongful death of such patient, resident, or person receiving services arising from the delivery or withholding of care when the emergency and subsequent conditions caused by the emergency result in a lack of resources, attributable to the disaster, that render such hospice, home care organization, private provider, assisted living facility, or adult day care center unable to provide the level or manner of care that otherwise would have been required in the absence of the emergency and that resulted in the injury or wrongful death at issue. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Hospices, certain, home care organizations, etc.; immunity from civil liability, COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (87-Y 9-N 1-A) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0007) | |
2020-10-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 7 (effective 10/13/20) | |
2020-10-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 14, 2020 | |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 7, 2020 |
2020-10-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5082ER) |
2020-10-02 | House | Enrolled |
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (87-Y 9-N 1-A) |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed House (87-Y 9-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 3-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB5082S1 |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20201039D-S1 |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Reconsideration of Passed by for the day agreed to (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20201039D-S1 |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201039D-S1 |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Incorporates SB5023 (Norment) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200757D |
Same As/Similar To
SB5023 (Similar To) 2020-08-26 - Incorporated by Judiciary
HB5059 (Same As) 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
HB5059 (Same As) 2020-10-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)