VA SB5083 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards; websites; COVID-19 virus mitigation plan; emergency. Requires each school board to post in a publicly accessible and conspicuous location on its website the plan outlining its strategies for mitigating the spread and public health risk of the COVID-19 virus, consistent with the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention and Virginia Department of Health mitigation recommendations, that the school board is required to submit to the Department of Education before reopening schools in accordance with Phase II and III guidelines pursuant to the June 8, 2020, order of the State Health Commissioner. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
School boards; board required to post on its website the COVID-19 virus mitigation plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0009) | |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 9 (effective 10/21/20) | |
2020-10-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 21, 2020 | |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on October 14, 2020 |
2020-10-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB5083ER) |
2020-10-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-10-02 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-29 | House | Passed House with amendment (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-29 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-09-29 | House | Amendment by Delegate Wilt agreed to |
2020-09-29 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-17 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (34-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-19 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-08-17 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200733D |