VA SB509 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charter; Town of Vinton. Amends the charter for the town of Vinton by requiring the town to follow the general law regarding filling council vacancies.
Title
Charter; Town of Vinton.
Sponsors
Sen. Ralph Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0807) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 807 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB509ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (95-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB509ER) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2010-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-26 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #1 | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-09 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-01-13 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103821D |