VA SB5107 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-25 - VOTE: Passage Emergency (75-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-25 - VOTE: Passage Emergency (75-Y 22-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; short-time compensation; sunset repeal; emergency. Repeals two sunset provisions from legislation enacted during the 2020 Regular Session of the General Assembly that, among other things, established a short-time compensation program that provides employers with the option of reducing the hours worked by employees while permitting the employees whose hours are reduced to receive partial compensation for lost wages. The bill also extends the date by which the Virginia Employment Commission is required to establish and implement such short-time compensation program from January 1, 2021 to January 1, 2022.The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Unemployment compensation; extends date VEC is required to establish, etc., short-time compensation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-25 - House - House: VOTE: Passage Emergency (75-Y 22-N) (Y: 75 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N) (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | House | VOTE: Passage Emergency (75-Y 22-N) |
2020-09-25 | House | Defeated by House (75-Y 22-N) (Requires 78 affirmative votes to pass) |
2020-09-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-09-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (18-Y 3-N) |
2020-09-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-09-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-09-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-02 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (32-Y 5-N) |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20200763D-E |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB5107E |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-08-28 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (12-Y 2-N) |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-08-18 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 08/18/20 20200763D |