VA SB513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enhanced Public Safety Telephone Services Act. Establishes requirements regarding the implementation of next generation 9-1-1 (NG9-1-1) service. By July 1, 2023, the 9-1-1 Services Board (the Board) is required to develop and implement NG9-1-1 transition plans to migrate public service answering points and originating service providers from E-911 to NG9-1-1. The measure alters the formula and criteria for the Board's distribution of funds from the Wireless E-911 Fund. The measure also repeals provisions regarding (i) notices that providers of Voice over Internet protocol service are required to give to subscribers regarding access to E-911 service; (ii) plans for access by Voice over Internet protocol service subscribers to obtain E-911 service; and (iii) the Board's Wireless Carrier E-911 Cost Recovery Subcommittee. This bill is identical to HB 1388.
Title
Enhanced Public Safety Telephone Services Act; implementation of 9-1-1 (NG9-1-1) services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533) | |
2018-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB513ER) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed House (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-28 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (37-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104513D |