VA SB513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driver's license suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses. Removes the existing provisions that allow a person's driver's license to be suspended (i) when he is convicted of or placed on deferred disposition for a drug offense, (ii) for non-payment of certain fees owed to a local correctional facility or regional jail, and (iii) for shoplifting motor fuel.
Title
Driver's license; suspensions for certain non-driving related offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 6-N) (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB513ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (35-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (65-Y 33-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with amendments (65-Y 33-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (14-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (15-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107868D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB513ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107868D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Incorporates SB512 (Edwards) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107868D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102914D |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Same As) 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0740)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 259.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 320.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 390.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 410.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 416.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 819.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 127.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |