VA SB516 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Finance
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; regional charter school divisions. Authorizes the Board of Education (the Board) to establish regional charter school divisions consisting of at least two but not more than three existing school divisions in regions in which each underlying school division has (i) an enrollment of more than 3,000 students and (ii) one or more schools that have accreditation denied status for two out of the past three years. The bill requires such regional charter school divisions to be supervised by a school board that consists of eight members appointed by the Board and one member appointed by the localities of each of the underlying divisions. The bill authorizes the school board, after a review by the Board, to review and approve public charter school applications in the regional charter school divisions and to contract with the applicant. The bill requires that the state share of Standards of Quality per pupil funding of the underlying school district in which the student resides be transferred to such school.
Title
Public schools; Board of Education to establish regional charter school divisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Finance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Finance (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (8-Y 7-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103149D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.16:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 212.16:7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 57.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 57.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |