VA SB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reports of registered voters and persons voting at elections. Requires local electoral boards to direct general registrars to investigate the list of registered voters whenever the number of registered voters in a county or city exceeds the population of persons age 18 or older, based on the most recent population estimate of the Weldon Cooper Center for Public Service of the University of Virginia. The bill also requires the local electoral boards to direct the general registrars to investigate the list of persons voting at an election whenever the number of persons voting at any election in a county or city exceeds the number of persons registered to vote in that county or city. The Department of Elections is required to provide certain data to any general registrar conducting such an investigation for the registrar's use during the investigation. The bill requires local electoral boards to make reports of the findings to the State Board of Elections and requires such reports to be made public.
Title
Registered voters and persons voting; reports of persons voting at elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Requires 27 affirmative votes to override veto |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate sustained Governor's veto (20-Y 19-N) |
2018-04-09 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB521ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (51-Y 49-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed House (51-Y 49-N) |
2018-03-01 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-27 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-23 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 6-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103155D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 405.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 406.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |