VA SB530 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public hearings prior to certain VDOT projects. Requires the institution of higher education to hold at least one public hearing before VDOT undertakes any safety-related or congestion management-related highway project requested by any college, university, or institution of higher education in the Commonwealth.
Title
Colleges, etc., projects, certain; required to hold at least one public hearing before undertaking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 53-N) (Y: 42 N: 55 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 23-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1,3 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 23-N) (Y: 73 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1,3 (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0848) | |
2012-05-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 848 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB530ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted in part | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (42-Y 53-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House rejected Governor's recommendation #2 (42-Y 53-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 23-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendations #1 and 3 (72-Y 23-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation #2 (21-Y 18-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendations #1,3 (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB530ER) | |
2012-03-07 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (57-Y 42-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed House (57-Y 42-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-28 | House: Reported from Transportation (17-Y 3-N) | |
2012-02-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-17 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-31 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB530S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 12104672D-S1 | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2012-01-30 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-01-27 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 12104672D-S1 | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2012-01-11 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12103969D |