VA SB542 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Securities Act; crowdfunding exemption. Repeals the sunset provision on the existing measure that authorizes the State Corporation Commission to adopt an exemption for limited offerings of securities by small and startup companies, known as equity crowdfunding, from the registration provisions of the Securities Act. These crowdfunding provisions, which were enacted in 2015, are currently scheduled to expire on July 1, 2020. The measure also broadens the existing exemption to apply to offerings conducted in accordance with Rule 147A adopted by the U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC). Because Rule 147A does not require the issuer of the securities to be incorporated or organized in the same state where the offering occurs, the measure creates a carve-out for offerings under Rule 147A from the existing requirement that the issuer be formed, organized, or existing under the laws of the Commonwealth.
Title
Securities Act; equity crowdfunding exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0279) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 279 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB542ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB542S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106798D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106798D-S1 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102490D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1339 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0331)