VA SB546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0988)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0988)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adult. Increases from 14 years of age to 16 years of age the minimum age at which a juvenile must be tried as an adult in circuit court for murder or aggravated malicious wounding; however, if the juvenile is 14 years of age or older but younger than 16 years of age, the court, on motion of the attorney for the Commonwealth, shall hold a transfer hearing. The minimum age is also raised from 14 to 16 for certain charges requiring notice of intent to try such juvenile as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth. In order to be tried as an adult in circuit court for the charges that under current law require notice of intent to proceed with trial as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth, the bill requires that (i) a report concerning the juvenile be prepared by the court services unit or other qualified agency and (ii) the attorney for the Commonwealth provide written notice that he intends to proceed with a preliminary hearing for trial of such juvenile as an adult, including affirmation that he has read the report.
Title
Juveniles; trial as adult, minimum age.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 6-N) (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0988) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 988 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB546ER) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title replaced 20108708D-H2 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (32-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (88-Y 10-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB546H2 |
2020-02-26 | House | Substitute by Delegate Mullin agreed to 20108708D-H2 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute rejected 20108510D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-21 | House | Floor substitute printed 20108708D-H2 (Mullin) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108510D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB546S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108088D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108088D-S1 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102990D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 249 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 270 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 284.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 285.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 299.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2:2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |