VA SB552 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-12 - Left in Finance and Appropriations
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Regional alternative education programs; funding. Requires the funding transferred from the Department of Education to the relevant school divisions in support of a regional alternative education program to be based on each such school division's need for the current school year. Under current law, such funding is transferred based on data accumulated during the prior school year.
Title
Regional alternative education programs; funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | Senate | Left in Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103948D |