VA SB566 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706)
Summary
Withdrawal of appeals from district courts; civil proceedings. Establishes procedures for parties who appeal decisions from district courts in civil actions to withdraw such appeals. Currently there are only procedures for the withdrawal of appeals from district courts in certain criminal cases. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Circuit and district courts; withdrawal of appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0706) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 706 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB566ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 14-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Passed House with amendment (86-Y 14-N) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-03 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read third time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-27 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (14-Y 6-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-02-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-12 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-07 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-05 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-04 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-14 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080229400 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB566 |