VA SB584 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibited acts by licensees; exceptions. Allows a mixed beverage licensee to make sangria. The bill defines sangria and provides that a mixed beverage licensee is not prohibited from pre-mixing containers of sangria to be served and sold in pitchers for consumption on the licensed premises. The bill also provides a mixed beverage licensee may (i) make sangria that contains brandy, triple sec, or other similar spirits, (ii) combine beer or spirits, or both, with wine pursuant to a patron’s order, or (iii) combine wine or spirits, or both, with beer pursuant to a patron’s order.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; prohibits certain acts by licensees, exceptions for sangria.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 875 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB584ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (83-Y 15-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (83-Y 15-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-14 | Senate: Governor's substitute printed 081882336-S2 | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB584ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (88-Y 11-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Passed House with amendments (88-Y 11-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Engrossed by House as amended | |
2008-03-04 | House: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-28 | House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (19-Y 3-N) | |
2008-02-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-30 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB584S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 085702336-S1 | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-01-29 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 085702336-S1 | |
2008-01-25 | Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081780340 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB584 |