VA SB584 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; service disabled veteran businesses procurement enhancement program. Establishes a statewide service disabled veteran business procurement enhancement program. The bill establishes a statewide goal of five percent service disabled veteran business utilization in all discretionary spending by state agencies in procurement orders, prime contracts, and subcontracts.
Title
Va. Public Procurement Act; establishes service disabled veteran businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Left in General Laws |
2018-02-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reengrossed by Senate - floor substitute SB584S1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator DeSteph agreed to 18106619D-S1 |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 18106619D-S1 (DeSteph) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments rejected |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendments reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103611D-E |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB584E |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103611D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 1605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.1:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4310.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4343 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |