VA SB596 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-05-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883)
Summary
Commission on Electric Utility Regulation. Continues the Commission on Electric Utility Restructuring as the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation and extends its scheduled expiration from July 1, 2008, until July 1, 2010. The Electric Utility Restructuring Act is renamed the Electric Utility Regulation Act, and provisions of the Act that address the transition to retail competition are revised to address provisions of 2007 legislation that curtailed many aspects of the scheduled re-regulation of electric generation services.
Title
Electric Utility Restructuring, Commission on; continue as Commission on Electric Utility Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-05-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0883) | |
2008-05-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 883 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Communicated to Governor | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (0-Y 39-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (1-Y 38-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB596ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-03-03 | House: Reported from Rules (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Rules | |
2008-02-21 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-14 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB596S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 080173284-S1 | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 080173284-S1 | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-09 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086528284 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB596 |