VA SB601 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Legal holidays; Lee-Jackson Day; Election Day. Designates Election Day, the Tuesday after the first Monday in November, as a state holiday and removes Lee-Jackson Day as a state holiday.
Title
Legal holidays; Election Day, removes Lee-Jackson Day as state holiday.
Sponsors
Sen. Louise Lucas [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0418) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 418 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB601ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Rules (12-Y 5-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102752D |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0417)