VA SB62 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865)
Summary
Voter registration procedures; applications and receipts. Provides that the state form for the application to register to vote shall contain a receipt that will be given to the applicant by any person receiving the application. The receipt states the name of the office or person receiving the application, the date received, and a phone number that the applicant may call to verify that he is registered. The requirements pertaining to the receipt are inapplicable when the applicant mails his application directly to a general registrar or the State Board of Elections.
Title
Voter registration; procedures for applications and receipts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0865) | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 865 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-04-23 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB62ER2) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2008-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-04-23 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-23 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-04-22 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-04-11 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2008-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB62ER) | |
2008-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Passed House (88-Y 9-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Read third time | |
2008-03-04 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-29 | House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government (Abbitt) | |
2008-02-15 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-15 | House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Elections | |
2008-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-11 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Communicated to House | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 084507248-E | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB62E | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2008-01-18 | Senate: Read second time | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-15 | Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (15-Y 0-N) | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2007-12-21 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084507248 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+SB62 |