VA SB633 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Music therapy; licensure. Requires the Board of Social Work to adopt regulations establishing a regulatory structure to license music therapists in the Commonwealth and establishes an advisory board to assist the Board in this process. Under the bill, no person shall engage in the practice of music therapy or hold himself out or otherwise represent himself as a music therapist unless he is licensed by the Board.
Title
Music therapy; definition of music therapist, licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (87-Y 9-N) (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0233) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 233 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 4, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB633ER) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (87-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Passed House (87-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-18 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB633S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106549D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106549D-S1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105169D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1562 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0103)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3709.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3709.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3709.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |