VA SB637 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Longitudinal Data System; workforce data. Requires the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia (SCHEV), through the Virginia Longitudinal Data System, to report additional information regarding the alignment of postsecondary education and workforce preparation in the Commonwealth. The bill also directs the Department of Motor Vehicles, the Virginia Employment Commission, and the Department of Taxation to cooperate with SCHEV to further assist in the collection and sharing of data regarding workforce analysis.
Title
Virginia Longitudinal Data System; workforce data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0590) | |
2018-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 590 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB637ER) |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-03-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-02-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-02-15 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 18103236D-E |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB637E |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103236D |