VA SB650 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small purchases. Increases from $100,000 to $200,000 the small purchases exemption under the Virginia Public Procurement Act for single or term contracts for goods and services other than professional services. The bill also removes outdated provisions related to informal solicitations required to be posted on the Department of General Services' central electronic procurement website.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; small purchases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0104) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 104 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 3, 2020 | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 25, 2020 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB650ER) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-18 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-17 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-13 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102091D-E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB650E |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102091D |
Same As/Similar To
HB452 (Same As) 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0044)