VA SB652 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0896)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0896)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fairfax County; policemen's retirement system. Authorizes any person who has been a member of another county retirement system and who withdraws therefrom and becomes a member of the policemen's retirement system established by a county that has adopted the urban county executive form of government (Fairfax County) to purchase membership service credit for service rendered while a member of such other county retirement system by paying into the policemen's retirement system all contributions that would have been due from the person had the person been a member of the policemen's retirement system for each of the years for which membership service credit is sought. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Fairfax County; policemen's retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Adam Ebbin [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] | Sen. Richard Saslaw [D] |
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0896) | |
2020-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 896 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB652ER) |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104020D-E |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB652E |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Boysko agreed to |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104020D |