VA SB657 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/20)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of Health; certificate of birth; change of sex. Requires the State Registrar to issue a new certificate of birth to show a change of sex upon request of the person and, if a certified copy of a court order changing the person's name is submitted, to include the person's new name. The bill provides that requirements related to obtaining a new certificate of birth to show a change of sex shall include a requirement that the person submit a form furnished by the State Registrar and completed by a health care provider from whom the person has received treatment stating that the person has undergone clinically appropriate treatment for gender transition but shall not include a requirement for evidence or documentation of any medical procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certificate of birth; new certificate issued to show change of sex.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 466 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-03SenateSigned by President
2020-03-02HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-02SenateBill text as passed Senate and House (SB657ER)
2020-03-02SenateEnrolled
2020-02-25SenateTitle replaced 20108473D-H1
2020-02-25SenateHouse substitute agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N)
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-21HousePassed House with substitute (52-Y 45-N)
2020-02-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute SB657H1
2020-02-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20108473D-H1
2020-02-21HouseRead third time
2020-02-20HouseRead second time
2020-02-18HouseCommittee substitute printed 20108473D-H1
2020-02-18HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2020-02-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2020-02-13HouseRead first time
2020-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-01-21SenateRead third time and passed Senate (24-Y 15-N)
2020-01-20SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB657S1
2020-01-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20105702D-S1
2020-01-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-01-20SenateRead second time
2020-01-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (10-Y 5-N)
2020-01-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 20105702D-S1
2020-01-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-01-07SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101198D

Same As/Similar To

HB1041 (Same As) 2020-03-25 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/20)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321261(n/a)See Bill Text
321269(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB657&201+sum+SB657
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB657+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB657S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB657H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB657ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0027+SB0657
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0063SB0657+SB0657
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0099SB0657+SB0657
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H12V0349+SB0657
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1166+SB0657
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0952SB0657+SB0657

Bill Comments

feedback