VA SB667 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1016)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting overdoses. Provides that no individual shall be subject to arrest or prosecution for the unlawful purchase, possession, or consumption of alcohol; possession of a controlled substance; possession of marijuana; intoxication in public; or possession of controlled paraphernalia if (i) such individual (a) seeks or obtains emergency medical attention for himself, if he is experiencing an overdose, or for another individual, if such other individual is experiencing an overdose, or (b) is experiencing an overdose and another individual seeks or obtains emergency medical attention for him; (ii) such individual remains at the scene of the overdose or at any location to which he or the individual requiring emergency medical attention has been transported; (iii) such individual identifies himself to the law-enforcement officer who responds; and (iv) the evidence for a prosecution of one of the enumerated offenses would have been obtained only as a result of an individual seeking or obtaining emergency medical attention. The bill also provides that no law-enforcement officer acting in a good faith shall be found liable for false arrest if it is later determined that the person arrested was immune from prosecution. Current law provides an affirmative defense to such offenses only when an individual seeks or obtains emergency medical attention for himself, if he is experiencing an overdose, or for another individual, if such other individual is experiencing an overdose.
Title
Overdoses; arrest and prosecution when experiencing or reporting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) (Y: 59 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 3-N) (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1016) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1016 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB667ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (59-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (59-Y 40-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as reengrossed 20104169D-E2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reengrossed by Senate as amended SB667E2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Boysko agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossment reconsidered by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104169D-E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB667E |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with amendment (9-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104169D |