VA SB67 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reporting lost or stolen firearms; civil penalty. Requires that, if a firearm is lost or stolen from a person who lawfully possessed it, such person shall report the loss or theft of the firearm to any local law-enforcement agency or the Department of State Police within 24 hours after such person discovers the loss or theft or is informed by a person with personal knowledge of the loss or theft. The bill requires the relevant law-enforcement agency to enter the report information into the National Crime Information Center. A violation is punishable by a civil penalty of not more than $250. The bill provides that a person who, in good faith, reports the loss or theft is immune from criminal or civil liability for acts or omissions that result from the loss or theft. The immunity does not apply to a person who knowingly gives a false report. The bill does not apply to the loss or theft of an antique firearm.
Title
Firearms; reporting those lost or stolen, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) (Y: 18 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read third time and defeated by Senate (18-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (7-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-11-22 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101053D |