VA SB673 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nonagricultural irrigation wells prohibited outside surficial aquifer. Prohibits any person from constructing a well in a ground water management area for nonagricultural irrigation purposes except in the surficial aquifer. The bill authorizes the State Water Control Board (the Board) to adopt regulations to develop a general permit for the regulation of irrigation withdrawals from the surficial aquifer greater than 300,000 gallons in any one month. The bill directs the Board to promulgate regulations establishing criteria for determining whether the quantity or quality of the ground water in a surficial aquifer is adequate to meet a proposed beneficial use and requires that such regulations specify the information required to be submitted to the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) by a golf course or any other person seeking a determination from the Department that either the quantity or quality of the ground water in a surficial aquifer is not adequate to meet a proposed beneficial use. The bill requires such regulations require the Department, within 30 days of receipt of a complete request, to make a determination as to the adequacy of the quantity or quality of the ground water in a surficial aquifer.
Title
Nonagricultural irrigation wells; prohibited outside surficial aquifer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) (Y: 55 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0670) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 670 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 10, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB673ER) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House (55-Y 45-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (12-Y 9-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB673S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105741D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105741D-S1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102478D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 262 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 266 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |