VA SB676 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recycling survey report. Requires solid waste planning units or localities with a population of greater than 90,000 to submit a recycling report annually and requires those units or localities with a population of 90,000 or less to submit the report at least once every four years. Currently, all solid waste planning units or localities are required to submit the report annually.
Title
Recycling survey; requires solid waste planning units and localities to submit report every 4 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0834) | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 834 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-04-18 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB676ER2) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Reenrolled | |
2012-04-18 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2012-04-18 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-04-17 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-04-09 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB676ER) | |
2012-03-08 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: Title replaced 12105568D-H1 | |
2012-03-06 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) | |
2012-03-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB676H1 | |
2012-03-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12105568D-H1 | |
2012-03-02 | House: Read third time | |
2012-03-01 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 12105568D-H1 | |
2012-02-29 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (20-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-22 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-13 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2012-02-08 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Printed as engrossed 12104304D-E | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended SB676E | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2012-02-07 | Senate: Read second time | |
2012-02-06 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-02 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (12-Y 1-N) | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 12104304D | |
2012-01-24 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |
Subjects
Conservation
Energy Conservation and Resources
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waste Disposal
Energy Conservation and Resources
Study Commissions, Committees, and Reports
Waste Disposal