VA SB679 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee established; sunset. Requires the Department of Environmental Quality to reestablish the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee, which expired on January 1, 2018, to assist the Department and the State Water Commission in the management of groundwater in the Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Area. The bill has an expiration date of July 1, 2025.
Title
Eastern Virginia Groundwater Management Advisory Committee; established, report, sunset provision.
Sponsors
Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0805) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 805 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB679ER) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with amendments BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB679S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20106575D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20106575D-S1 |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rules with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103069D |