VA SB687 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bicycles; signage and road markings. Requires the Department of Transportation to erect and maintain signs in high pedestrian, Segway, bicycle, moped, animal, and animal-drawn vehicle traffic volume areas signs that say "Share the Road" and that note existing law requiring passing motor vehicles to pass at least three feet to the left of such vehicles. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Bicycles; signage, effective clause.
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Vogel [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (20-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed bill reprinted 20105989D-ES1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20105989D-ES1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB687ES1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20105989D-S1 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20105989D-S1 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103078D |