VA SB695 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0939)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0939)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Telemarketing; financial exploitation; agency communication. Directs the Attorney General to establish ongoing communication with the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services to ensure that adults 60 years of age or older or 18 years of age or older and incapacitated have access to information regarding the prevention of potential patterns of financial exploitation.
Title
Telemarketing; financial exploitation, agency communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-20 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0939) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 939 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-02 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB695ER) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-25 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-25 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20102848D-E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB695E |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred to Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102848D |