VA SB71 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Emergency protective orders; arrests for certain offenses. Includes special conservators of the peace who have met the certification requirements for a law-enforcement officer in the definition of a law-enforcement officer for the purposes of obtaining an emergency protective order and for making arrests for assault and battery against a household member, stalking, and violation of a protective order.
Title
Emergency protective orders; arrests for domestic assault, definition of law-enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0797) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 797 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB71ER2) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB71ER) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 14105102D-H1 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute SB71H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Substitute by Delegate Bell, R.B. agreed to 14105102D-H1 |
2014-02-24 | House | Committee amendments rejected |
2014-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Floor substitute printed 14105102D-H1 (Bell, Robert B.) |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB71S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 14103993D-S1 |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 14103993D-S1 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103119D |
Same As/Similar To
HB285 (Same As) 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0779)
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 253.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |