VA SB72 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public defender offices; Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and County of Prince William. Establishes a public defender office for the Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and the County of Prince William.
Title
Public defender offices; Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and County of Prince William.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Surovell [D] | Sen. George Barker [D] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Barbara Favola [D] |
Sen. Jeremy McPike [D] | Sen. Richard Stuart [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376) | |
2020-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 376 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB72ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-24 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (33-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (9-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Moved from Courts of Justice to Judiciary due to a change of the committee name |
2019-11-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2019-11-23 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100915D |
Same As/Similar To
HB366 (Same As) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)