VA SB726 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ballast Water Control Report. Changes name from Hampton Roads Maritime Association to Virginia Maritime Association.
Title
Hampton Roads Maritime Association; changes name to Virginia Maritime Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 815 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Reenrolled bill text (SB726ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-20 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's recommendation received by Senate | |
2010-04-13 | Senate: Governor's substitute printed 10105948D-S1 | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-05 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB726ER) | |
2010-03-05 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | House: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-24 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-16 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | Senate: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Presented and ordered printed 10104601D | |
2010-01-25 | Senate: Unanimous consent to introduce |