VA SB731 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1108)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1108)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rate of return for investor-owned electric utilities. Provides that the State Corporation Commission, in determining a fair rate of return on common equity for an investor-owned electric utility after January 1, 2020, shall not set such rate (i) lower than the average of either (a) the average of the returns on common equity of the utility's peer group reported to the Securities and Exchange Commission for the three most recent annual periods or (b) the authorized returns on common equity that is set by the applicable regulatory commission for other investor-owned electric utilities in the utility's peer group or (ii) higher than 150 basis points above such average.
Title
Investor-owned electric utilities; rate of return on common equity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 17-N) (Y: 75 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 25-N) (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N) (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) (Y: 1 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (69-Y 25-N) (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1108) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1108 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB731ER) |
2020-03-08 | House | VOTE: Adoption (75-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (75-Y 17-N) |
2020-03-08 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Bourne, Ayala, Wilt |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Spruill, Norment |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate acceded to request (36-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | House requested conference committee |
2020-03-05 | House | House insisted on amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendments rejected by Senate (1-Y 39-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (69-Y 25-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendments (69-Y 25-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Amendments by Delegate Jonesagreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-03-02 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendments (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (36-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20101582D-E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB731E |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned C&L sub: Energy |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101582D |