VA SB735 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1266)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms. Establishes insurance, taxation, recordkeeping, disclosure, and safety recall requirements for peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms, defined in the bill. The taxation provisions will become effective on October 1, 2020.
Title
Peer-to-peer vehicle sharing platforms; definitions, establishes requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-22 - House - House: VOTE: (88-Y 3-N) (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1266) | |
2020-04-22 | House | Enacted, Chapter 1266 (effective - see bill) |
2020-04-22 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB735ER2) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Reenrolled |
2020-04-22 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-04-22 | House | VOTE: (88-Y 3-N) |
2020-04-22 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (88-Y 3-N) |
2020-04-22 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-04-11 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB735ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 20108534D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Passed House with substitute (95-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-26 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB735H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108534D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-25 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-21 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108534D-H1 |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20108051D-ES2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB735ES2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Newman agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108051D-S2 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute rejected 20107434D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108051D-S2 |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB750 (Cosgrove) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Incorporates SB749 (Cosgrove) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 1-N 1-A) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107434D-S1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (12-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105109D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 2 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1745 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 1748 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.29 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.31 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 207.32 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |