VA SB753 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia National Guard; state active duty for emergency response; pay and allowances for members. Provides that whenever called to state active duty in response to certain emergencies, members of the National Guard and the Virginia Defense Force receive pay and allowance equal to their rank and years of service, as determined by the Department of Military Affairs. The bill also authorizes the Adjutant General to increase state active duty pay on an annual basis by a rate not to exceed the most recent percentage increase in basic pay for members of the Armed Forces. Current law provides that (i) officers of the National Guard receive the same pay and allowances as prescribed for members of like rank in the United States Armed Forces, (ii) members of the National Guard receive the same pay and allowances as if they were on a day of Annual Training, and (iii) members of the Virginia Defense Force called to state active duty receive the same pay and allowances as persons of like grade in the National Guard for a day of Annual Training, capped at 25 years of service.
Title
Virginia National Guard; state active duty for emergency response.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryce Reeves [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Amanda Chase [R] |
Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Mark Peake [R] |
Sen. Todd Pillion [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0832) | |
2020-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 832 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB753ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | Senate | House amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed House with amendment BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-03-04 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-20 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20104735D-E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended SB753E |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reconsidered by Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104735D |