VA SB765 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-30 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Coal ash ponds; mandatory testing of drinking water wells. Requires the owner or operator of any coal ash pond in the Chesapeake Bay watershed that is closed by capping in place to complete a survey of all drinking water wells within one mile of the pond by October 1, 2018. The bill requires the utility to commission an independent well water test on behalf of the owner of each such well by January 1, 2019, and requires such a test once per year during each of the five years following the approval of the closure of the coal ash pond, and once every five years thereafter. The bill provides that if any test exceeds groundwater quality standards for constituents associated with coal ash, the Board shall instruct the utility to provide alternate water supplies to the owner of the well. The bill requires the Department of Environmental Quality to consider the results of the tests in its permitting, monitoring, or enforcement proceedings.
Title
Coal ash ponds; mandatory testing of drinking water wells in Chesapeake Bay watershed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Continued to 2019 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rereferred from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104578D |