VA SB771 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Remedies; limitation on recovery in certain medical malpractice actions. Increases from $2 million to $2.05 million, on July 1, 2012, the cap on the recovery in actions against health care providers for medical malpractice. Thereafter, the cap is increased by $50,000 annually with the last increase on July 1, 2031.
Title
Remedies; increases cap on recovery in certain medical malpractice actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 11-N) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0759) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Bill became law, Chapter 759 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-04-06 | House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (92-Y 6-N) | |
2011-04-06 | House: Governor's veto overridden (92-Y 6-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Passed in enrolled form (29-Y 11-N) | |
2011-04-06 | Senate: Passed by temporarily | |
2011-04-05 | Senate: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB771ER) | |
2011-03-03 | Senate: Enrolled | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Title replaced 11105269D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Passed House with substitute (92-Y 6-N) | |
2011-02-24 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB771H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11105269D-H1 | |
2011-02-24 | House: Read third time | |
2011-02-23 | House: Read second time | |
2011-02-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | House: Committee substitute printed 11105269D-H1 | |
2011-02-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB771S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Committee substitute agreed to 11104063D-S1 | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Reading of substitute waived | |
2011-02-01 | Senate: Read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-28 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Committee substitute printed 11104063D-S1 | |
2011-01-26 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-11 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-12-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-12-08 | Senate: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100865D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1459 (Same As) 2011-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0758)