VA SB780 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Hydroelectric plant revenue sharing agreement among certain localities. Requires the Counties of Buchanan, Dickenson, Lee, Russell, Scott, Tazewell, and Wise and the City of Norton to enter into a perpetual revenue sharing agreement regarding a certain electric storage or generation facility to be located in one of these localities. The measure establishes the percentage of the revenue to be allocated to each locality and provides that the host locality shall receive an additional share of six percent of the revenue. Any direct costs of infrastructure improvements incurred by the host locality for purposes of the facility will be allocated among the localities in the same proportion as the revenues from the facility. This bill is identical to HB 1555.
Title
Hydroelectric plant; revenue sharing agreement among certain localities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0206) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 206 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB780ER) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled |
2018-02-20 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | House | Read third time |
2018-02-19 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB780S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18106147D-S1 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read second time |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18106147D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (11-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104617D |