VA SB791 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Management of the menhaden fishery. Requires the Virginia Marine Resources Commission to adopt regulations necessary to manage Atlantic menhaden, including those necessary to comply with the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Commission Interstate Fishery Management Plan for Atlantic Menhaden. The bill repeals several Code sections relating to quotas, allocation of allowable landings, and administrative procedures that will be included in a regulatory framework for managing the fishery. The bill directs the Commissioner of Marine Resources to establish a Menhaden Management Advisory Committee to provide guidance to the Commission.
Title
Menhaden; management of the fishery.
Sponsors
Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Sen. John Cosgrove [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] | Sen. Ghazala Hashmi [D] |
Sen. Richard Stuart [R] | Sen. Jennifer Kiggans [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Sen. Lionell Spruill [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption - Emergency (72-Y 18-N) (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0356) | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enacted, Chapter 356 (effective 3/12/20) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reenrolled bill text (SB791ER2) |
2020-03-12 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-03-12 | House | VOTE: Adoption - Emergency (72-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-12 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (72-Y 18-N) |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Emergency clause added by Governor's recommendation | |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (37-Y 2-N) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Governor's recommendation received by Senate |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 6, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB791ER) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title replaced 20108666D-H1 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | House substitute agreed to by Senate (39-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Passed House with substitute (79-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute SB791H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20108666D-H1 |
2020-02-24 | House | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108666D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107115D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB791ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Emergency clause deleted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Lewis agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107115D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107115D-S1 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB1054 (Stuart) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB402 (Hashmi) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB357 (Cosgrove) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB194 (Cosgrove) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Incorporates SB157 (DeSteph) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned ACNR sub: Menhaden |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102893D |
Same As/Similar To
SB157 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB194 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB357 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB402 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB1054 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
HB1448 (Same As) 2020-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
SB194 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB357 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB402 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
SB1054 (Similar To) 2020-02-04 - Incorporated by Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
HB1448 (Same As) 2020-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 1000.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 400.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
28 | 2 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |