VA SB793 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Hearing: Feb 24 in House Room 3
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes. Provides that an incarcerated person is eligible for parole if (i) such person was sentenced by a jury prior to the date of the Supreme Court of Virginia decision in Fishback v. Commonwealth, 260 Va. 104 (June 9, 2000), in which the Court held that a jury should be instructed on the fact that parole has been abolished, for a noncapital felony committed on or after the abolition of parole went into effect (on January 1, 1995) and (ii) the jury was not instructed on the abolition of parole in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parole; exception to limitation on the application of parole statutes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 12-N) (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2020-02-14HouseRead first time
2020-02-14HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2020-02-11SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (27-Y 12-N)
2020-02-11SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute SB793S1
2020-02-11SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20107401D-S1
2020-02-11SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-11SenateRead second time
2020-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-06SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-03SenateReported from Judiciary with substitute (13-Y 1-N)
2020-02-03SenateCommittee substitute printed 20107401D-S1
2020-02-03SenateIncorporates SB821 (morrissey)
2020-01-24SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law
2020-01-17SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2020-01-17SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (12-Y 0-N)
2020-01-08SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2020-01-08SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103371D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531165.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+SB793
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB793+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+SB793S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S09V0017+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S03V0166+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0275+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0457SB0793+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0528SB0793+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0550SB0793+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0554SB0793+SB0793
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0555SB0793+SB0793

Bill Comments

feedback