VA SB798 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1019)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Driving after forfeiture of license. Specifies that a person is guilty of an offense of driving or operating a motor vehicle (i) after his driver's license has been revoked for certain offenses; (ii) in violation of the terms of a restricted license; (iii) without an ignition interlock system if one is required; or (iv) if the person's license had been restricted, suspended, or revoked for certain driving under the influence offenses, with a blood alcohol content of 0.02 percent or more, only if such person was driving or operating the motor vehicle on a highway, as defined in Title 46.2, Motor Vehicles.
Title
Driving after forfeiture of license; guilty of certain offenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1019) | |
2020-04-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1019 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB798ER) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2020-03-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed House (63-Y 36-N) |
2020-03-05 | House | Read third time |
2020-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (36-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100954D |