VA SB806 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Ex parte requests for investigative services or expert assistance in criminal cases. Allows a defendant or his attorney, when such defendant is charged with a felony offense or Class 1 misdemeanor and is financially unable to pay for expert assistance, to move the circuit court to designate another judge in the same circuit to hear an ex parte request for appointment of a qualified expert to assist in the preparation of the defendant's defense. Upon receiving the defendant's or his attorney's declaration of need for confidentiality, the designated ex parte judge shall conduct an ex parte hearing on the request for authorization to obtain expert assistance. After a hearing upon the motion and upon a showing that the provision of the requested expert services would materially assist the defendant in preparing his defense and the denial of such services would result in a fundamentally unfair trial, the court shall order the appointment of a qualified expert. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriation act.
Title
Criminal cases; ex parte requests for expert assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee substitute printed 20108512D-H1 |
2020-02-19 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-02-14 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-14 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 4-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 20107692D-ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment SB806ES1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20107692D-S1 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (15-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20107692D-S1 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Assigned Judiciary sub: Criminal Law |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103178D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 266.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 266.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |